Former Governors
Governors who have left the governing board over the last 12 months:
Mrs F Horrocks
Chair of the Standards Committee (Data & Performance Analysis)
Parent Governor
Appointed by the Governing Board
(no nominations received)
First appointed: 14.05.2019
Term of office: 4 years
Left the Governing Board 31.12.2022
Committee Membership:
Curriculum & Pupils’ Issues Committee
Standards Committee (Data & Performance Analysis)
Eligible to sit on all standard committees
Link Governor for: Governor Training
Employer: Northern Care Alliance
Business interests: None declared
Personal interests: Children on roll
Other governance roles: None declaredMrs T Hatton
Associate Member (ex-officio)
Deputy Headteacher
Term of office: 05.12.2018 until 04.12.2022
Re-appointed 05.12.2022 until 04.12.2026
Ceased to be an Associate Member: 09.01.2023Committee Membership:
Curriculum & Pupils’ Issues Committee
Employer: Governors of Cardinal Langley RC High School
Business interests: None declared
Personal interests: None declared
Other governance roles: None declaredMr J Doolan
Chair of the Resources Committee
Co-opted Governor
Appointed by the Governing Board
First appointed: 10.07.2018
Re-appointed 10.07.2022
Term of office: 4 years
Left the Governing Board 03.07.2023
Committee Membership:
Resources Committee
Eligible to sit on all standard committees
Link Governor for: Science
Employer: Self-employed with Irwell Mortgages
Business interests: None declared
Directorships: Proprietor, JDL Financial Solutions
Personal interests: Children on roll
Other governance roles: None declaredMrs C Keefe
Associate Member (ex-officio)
Senior Assistant Headteacher
Term of office: 28.09.2022 until 27.09.2026
Ceased to be an Associate Member: 03.07.2023
Committee Membership:
Curriculum & Pupils’ Issues Committee
Employer: Governors of Cardinal Langley RC High School
Business interests:None declared
Personal interests: None declared
Other governance roles: None declaredMrs D Banham
Foundation Governor
Appointed by the Diocese of Salford
Term of office: 4 years
First appointed: 08.10.2021
Formerly in office as a Parent Governor 08.12.2017 to 07.10.2021
Left the Governing Board 28.11.2023
Committee Membership:
Curriculum & Pupils’ Issues Committee
Standards Committee (Data & Performance Analysis)
Eligible to sit on all standard committees
Link Governor for: Additional Needs/SEND; Cared-for Children (C4C)
Employer: E-ACT Oldham Academy North
Business interests: None declared
Personal Interests: Child & God-children on roll
Other governance roles: AAG member at the Oldham Academy North